IL HB5647 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Residential Weather Radio Safety Act. Provides that every contractor or manufacturer building a new residence in this State shall install a weather radio within each residence. Provides that "residence" includes homes, apartment buildings, condominiums, multifamily homes, manufactured homes or mobile homes, nursing or sheltered care homes, and veterans homes. Establishes requirements for the weather radios. Provides that violation of the Act is a business offense with a fine of $500 per violation.
Title
RESIDENTIAL WEATHER RADIOS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | House | Tabled |
2014-05-07 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-24 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Housing Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5647&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB5647.htm |