IL HB5852 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code to create the Mental Health Task Force for Communication, Intelligence, Empathy, Emotion, and Empowerment. Provides that the purpose of the task force is to explore and determine a method and program for all students in primary and secondary school to receive mandated mental health care. Sets forth the membership of the task force. Contains provisions concerning the intent of the program, the goals of mandated health care, and task force meetings, duties, and reporting. Repeals these provisions on January 1, 2023. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHCD-MENTAL HEALTH TASK FORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-11-10HouseFirst Reading
2020-10-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2020-10-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2020-10-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105522-90New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback