IL HJR0002 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, January 12, 2023, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Tuesday, January 31, 2023, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, February 01, 2023, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, February 02, 2023 , and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 07, 2023, or until the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, January 24, 2023, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, January 25, 2023, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, January 26, 2023, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 07, 2023, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-12 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford; 3-6(a) |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-01-12 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2023-01-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HJR/10300HJ0002.htm |