IL HJR0016 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Resolution Adopted 112-002-001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Resolution Adopted 112-002-001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulates the 107 graduates of the Urban Prep Academy for Young Men in Chicago for all graduating from high school and getting accepted into college.
Title
CNGRTS-URBAN PREP ACAD SENIORS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-002-001 |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2011-05-11 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 024-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2011-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |