IL HJR0016 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Congress to enact federal legislation granting statehood to the people of Washington, D.C.
Title
WASHINGTON, D.C. STATEHOOD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 71 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Be Adopted Executive; 011-005-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-05-05 | House | Resolution Adopted 071-042-000 |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-02-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |