IL HJR0018 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Task Force on Black Immigrants to study the state of Black immigrants in Illinois and provide recommendations on how to assist them.
Title
BLACK IMMIGRANTS TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 046-000-000 |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Be Adopted Human Rights; 006-000-000 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Human Rights |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-04-18 | House | Resolution Adopted 113-000-000 |
2023-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-03-15 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |