IL HJR0029 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, April 20, 2023, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 25, 2023, or the the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 25, 2023, or to the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Steve Stadelman; 3-6(a) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-04-19 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2023-04-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=29&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HJR/10300HJ0029.htm |