IL HJR0035 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports local governments and municipalities that adopt Responsible Bidder Ordinances.
Title
RESPONSIBLE BIDDER ORDINANCE
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-002-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=35&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0035.htm |