IL HJR0037 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of U.S. Route 50 as it runs through Odin as the "Lance Cpl. Nicholas Brian Kleiboeker Highway".
Title
LANCE CPL KLEIBOEKER HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - Motion in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-05-24 | House | Resolution Adopted 101-000-000 |
2023-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg |
2023-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-05-18 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 017-000-000 |
2023-05-11 | House | Referred to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Blaine Wilhour |