IL HJR0051 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares December 9, 2013 as Computer Science Education Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
COMPUTER SCIENCE ED DAY
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-09-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=51&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJR/09800HJ0051.htm |