IL HJR0051 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges that the General Assembly adopt an FY 2018 revenue estimate that is inclusive of the figures provided by the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability and the Governor's Office of Management and Budget and outlines the funds that will be available during the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2017, for the purposes of meeting the constitutional obligation set forth in subsection (b) of Section 2 of Article VIII of the Illinois Constitution.
Title
FY18 HOUSE REVENUE ESTIMATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-04-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=51&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0051.htm |