IL HJR0056 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Route 59 in West Chicago from Route 38 to Route 64 as the "SFC Theodore A. Katsoolias Memorial Highway".
Title
SFC T KATSOOLIAS MEMORIAL HGWY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-04-10 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 015-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=56&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HJR/10300HJ0056.htm |