IL HJR0074 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of Illinois Route 161 between the intersection of Hanover Street in Germantown and the intersection of South B Street in Bartelso as the Firefighter Tim Jansen Memorial Highway.
Title
TIM JANSEN MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-15 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - Motion in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - Motion in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 012-000-000 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-07 | House | Resolution Adopted 106-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-03-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 015-000-000 |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles E. Meier |