IL HJR0078 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recommends that in any fiscal year in which the rate of tuition at a public university in this State is increased by any percentage above the percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers for all items during the 12-month calendar year preceding that fiscal year, the board of trustees of the university not increase, in that fiscal year, the base salary of the president of the university and other principal administrators who are employed by the university and whose base salary exceeds $200,000.
Title
ST UNIVERSITY-TUITION-SALARY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-07-27 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-02 | House | Remains in Higher Education Committee |
2012-05-02 | House | Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Higher Education Committee; 006-002-000 |
2012-05-01 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2012-05-01 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Higher Education Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-04-30 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2012-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=78&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HJR/09700HJ0078.htm |