IL HJRCA0001 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Prohibits a person from holding the office of State Senator or State Representative, or a combination of those offices, for more than 10 years. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
GA MEMBERS-TERM LIMITS
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Sandack [R] | Rep. John Anthony [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
Rep. Christine Winger [R] | Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] | Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R] | Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2015-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2015-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2015-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2015-01-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-15 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ron Sandack |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJRCA/09900HC0001.htm |