IL HJRCA0023 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-03 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-03 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend The Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Limits a person's total service in the office of Speaker of the House of Representatives, President of the Senate, Minority Leader of the House, or Minority Leader of the Senate to a total of 10 years. Effective upon being declared adopted and applies to service on or after the second Wednesday in January, 2015.
Title
LEGISLATURE-OFFICER LIMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-03 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46 |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=23&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJRCA/09800HC0023.htm |