IL HJRCA0033 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-03 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-03 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Revenue Article of the Illinois Constitution. Removes a provision that provides that a tax on income shall be measured at a non-graduated rate. Provides that there may be one tax on the income of individuals and corporations, that this may be a fair tax where lower rates apply to lower income levels and higher rates apply to higher income levels, and that no government other than the State may impose a tax on or measured by income. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-INCOME TAX RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-03 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46 |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-03-27 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-03-27 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-006-001 |
2014-03-27 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-03-27 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-002-000 |
2014-03-11 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2014-03-05 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2013-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2013-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2013-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2013-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2013-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2013-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-09-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2013-09-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-09-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-09-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-09-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-08-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2013-08-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2013-08-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-06-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-06-19 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-05-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=33&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJRCA/09800HC0033.htm |