IL HR0007 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the week of January 22 through January 28, 2023 as CRNA Week in the State of Illinois. Recognizes the importance of Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists (CRNAs) and Student Registered Nurse Anesthetists (SRNAs) and their roles in providing high-quality care for the people of Illinois.
Title
CRNA WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-03-29 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-000-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=7&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0007.htm |