IL HR0085 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-16)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-16)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 2, 2019 as Pay Equity Day.
Title
PAY EQUITY DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-03-20 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-19 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=85&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0085.htm |