IL HR0110 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-17)
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-17)
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Sets forth the amounts of general funds estimated by the House of Representatives to be available during State fiscal year 2012.
Title
FY12 HOUSE REVENUE ESTIMATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Nybo |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Barickman |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire |
2011-03-08 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended 112-000-000 |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross |
2011-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2011-03-03 | House | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2011-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley; ; Rep. David Harris |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-02-28 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-02-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |