IL HR0110 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes application to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for the calling of a convention of the states limited to proposing amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office for its officials and for members of Congress.
Title
US CONST-ART V-APPLICATION
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Reginald Phillips [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=110&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0110.htm |