IL HR0196 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes the benefits that equine therapy can have on the lives of children, especially those that have experienced trauma, abuse, and neglect. Urges the Department of Children and Family Services to consider implementing an equine therapy pilot program in order to help children process trauma and address their behavioral and emotional needs.
Title
DCFS-EQUINE THERAPY
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-05-09 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000 |
2023-04-25 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=196&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0196.htm |