IL HR0255 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to waive the 30-Day Readmission Rule for those afflicted with sickle cell disease.
Title
URGE HFS-SICKLE CELL TREATMENT
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Dunkin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-01-03 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=255&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0255.htm |