IL HR0273 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President Barack Obama and members of the United States Senate and House of Representatives to reauthorize the United States Export-Import Bank before June 30, 2015.
Title
EX-IM BANK - REAUTHORIZE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-04-20 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-000-000 |
2015-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-03-23 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-03-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=273&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0273.htm |