IL HR0358 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Teachers' Retirement System and the State Universities Retirement System to pursue an Internal Revenue Service ruling on the compliance of Tier 2 with safe harbor provisions under Section 3121(b)(7)(F) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986.
Title
PENSION TIER 2 - IMPACT
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Scott Drury [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-03 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2015-04-21 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=358&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0358.htm |