IL HR0405 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-24 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-24 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes National Domestic Violence Awareness Month in October 2023 and supports and commends the efforts of those people and organizations who work tirelessly to help victims break free of the devastating effects of domestic abuse.
Title
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AWARE MTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-09-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-09-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2023-09-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=405&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0405.htm |