IL HR0546 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the NCAA to admit the flaws in its investigation of Reggie Bush and restore his statistics for the 2005 season. Urges the Heisman Trophy Trust to restore Reggie Bush's Heisman Trophy award.
Title
REGGIE BUSH-NCAA INVESTIGATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-04-03 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 011-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=546&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0546.htm |