IL HR0549 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 10-16, 2024 as "MS Awareness Week" in the State of Illinois and encourages all Illinoisans to learn more about multiple sclerosis and what they can do to support individuals with MS and their families. Recognizes the importance of finding the cause and cure of MS and expresses appreciation for the dedication that the National Multiple Sclerosis Society has shown toward creating a world free of MS.
Title
MS AWARENESS WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to Public Health Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=549&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0549.htm |