IL HR0599 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the elimination of the Illinois High School Association's (IHSA) authority to restrict eligible student-athletes from transferring schools.
Title
IHSA-ELIMINATE TRANSFER LIMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-03-21 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=599&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0599.htm |