IL HR0630 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 3 through March 9, 2024 as Illinois Soil Health Week in the State of Illinois. Encourages the celebration of Soil Health Week and its related activities to increase the awareness of Illinois farmers, eaters, and those involved in agribusiness of the importance of the air and water quality environment for all citizens of this State.
Title
IL SOIL HEALTH WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-04-02 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=630&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0630.htm |