IL HR0664 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 2024 as Trisomy Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
TRISOMY AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-04-03 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-27 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=664&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0664.htm |