IL HR0688 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-31 - Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-31 - Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Congress to recognize outstanding student debt as a crisis for Americans seeking an education that endangers the well-being of Americans and to work to develop and enact legislation that will forgive student loans for all current student loan borrowers and prevent future students from shouldering an insurmountable burden of debt.
Title
STUDENT DEBT CRISIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-08-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-007-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=688&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0688.htm |