IL SB0037 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Food Allergy Awareness Act. Provides that each retail food establishment in this State shall (1) prominently display a poster relative to food allergy awareness and developed by the Department of Public Health in the staff area and (2) include on all menus a Department-approved notice to customers of the customer's obligation to inform the server about any food allergies. Provides that a certified food service sanitation manager who supervises the operations of a retail food establishment shall, in order to obtain his or her certification, view as part of an otherwise approved certified food service sanitation manager education program a video concerning food allergies. Provides that the Department shall develop a program for restaurants to be designated as Food Allergy Friendly. Requires the Department to submit a report to the General Assembly concerning the impact of the provisions of the Act. Contains other provisions.
Title
FOOD ALLERGY AWARENESS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=37&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB0037.htm |