IL SB0066 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a deduction in an amount equal to the product of the total capital expenditures incurred by the taxpayer for labor and materials to install mechanical insulation property during the taxable year multiplied by the applicable percentage. Provides that the applicable percentage is the lesser of: (i) 30%; or (ii) the difference between: (a) the energy savings, expressed as a percentage, obtained by placing the mechanical insulation property in service in connection with a mechanical system and (b) the energy savings, expressed as a percentage, that the property is required to meet by standard 90.1-2007, developed and published by the American Society of Heating, Refrigerating and Air-Conditioning Engineers. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-MECHANICAL INSULATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-02-22 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Income Taxes |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=66&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0066.htm |