IL SB0069 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0394
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that the court shall not order the sealing of the records of arrests or charges not initiated by arrest that result in a conviction for financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability, aggravated identity theft against a person 60 years of age or older or a person with a disability, abuse or criminal neglect of a long term care facility resident, or criminal abuse or neglect of an elderly person or person with a disability. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person who commits the offense of financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability may be tried in any one of the following counties in which (1) any part of the offense occurred or (2) the victim or one of the victims reside. Provides that theft by deception from a person with a disability is a Class 2 felony. Provides that consent is not a defense to financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability if the accused knew or had reason to know that the elderly person or a person with a disability lacked capacity to consent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCIAL EXPLOITATION ELDERLY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0394
2019-08-16SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-16SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law
2019-05-21SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-21SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2019
2019-05-21SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 016-001-000
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-04-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-27HouseArrived in House
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-001-001
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 008-001-000
2019-03-19SenateReported Back To Criminal Law; 002-001-000
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-02-20SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text
72051-6Amended CodeCitation Text
720516-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720516-1.3Amended CodeCitation Text
720517-56Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback