IL SB0104 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Provides that overtime compensation provisions of the Law do not apply to any employee who is a member of a bargaining unit recognized by the Illinois Labor Relations Board and whose union has contractually agreed to an alternate shift schedule as allowed by specified provisions of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938.
Title
MIN WAGE-OVERTIME-ALTERN SHIFT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-05-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-05-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 014-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 1, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 14, 2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 105 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |