IL SB0162 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-05 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-05 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Antitrust Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Act.
Title
WORKERS' COMPENSATION-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Rep. Michael Madigan [D] |
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. John Bradley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-08-05 | House | First Reading |
2015-08-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-08-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-08-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2015-08-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-019-001 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-002-001 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As August 5, 2015 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |