IL SB0205 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employee Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides the alternative formula for State electrical workers. Exempts the change from the provisions concerning new benefit increases. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-SERS-ALT FORM-ELECTRICN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | To Pensions & Investments Subcommittee on Pension Benefit Enhancements | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Pensions and Investments | |
2009-02-03 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Larry K. Bomke | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-03 | First Reading | |
2009-02-03 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=205&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0205.htm |