IL SB0209 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the definition of "conviction".
Title
CORRECTIONS-MITIGATING FACTOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0384 |
2015-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000 |
2015-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2015-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-05-11 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-05-11 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-04-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |