IL SB0211 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that State purchasing officers or a State agency may enter into renewable energy resources contracts and leases for a period of time deemed to be in the best interest of the State, but not exceeding 25 years inclusive of proposed contract or lease renewals. Defines "renewable energy resources". Effective immediately.
Title
PROCURE-RENEW ENERGY RESOURCES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0193 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date August 2, 2019 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-008-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bennett |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 62 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 25-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |