IL SB0218 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning State policy.
Title
EMPLOYMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Forby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2009-08-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Held in Labor | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Labor | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-03 | First Reading | |
2009-02-03 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=218&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0218.htm |