IL SB0246 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Park District Code. Excludes contracts for fuel (such as diesel, gasoline, oil, aviation, or propane), lubricants, or other petroleum products from contracts that must be awarded by competitive bidding. Effective immediately.
Title
PARK DIST-PETROLEUM CONTRACTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0304 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-044-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-003-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1205 | 8-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |