IL SB0265 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Governor's submission of the State budget.
Title
SEX OFFENDER MANAGEMENT BOARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-04 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0257 |
2011-08-04 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-04 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 20 | 50-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |