IL SB0265 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0081
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0081
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Capital Development Board Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Act.
Title
NOTARY PUBLIC-SEAL-NOTICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0081 |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000 |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2017-05-17 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-10 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-001 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3105 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |