IL SB0289 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes an appropriation of $717,765,720 from the General Revenue Fund to the State Board of Education for early childhood education. Makes various appropriations from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for early intervention, for grants and administration expenses associated with the Maternal and Child Home Visiting Program, for grants and administrative expenses associated with the Healthy Families Program, and for grants and administrative expenses associated with child care services, including prior year costs. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
$ST BD ED/DHS-CHILDREN
Sponsors
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Cristina Pacione-Zayas [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] |
Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Sen. Willie Preston [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations- Education |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations- Education |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |