IL SB0352 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1089
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1089
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1089 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-050-001 |
2014-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-003-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 067-047-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-27 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-26 | House | First Reading |
2014-05-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 033-015-000 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Verified |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-003-000 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 16, 2014 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 8, 2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |