IL SB0354 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the amount and nature of medical assistance.
Title
PUBLIC AID-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] |
Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |