IL SB0375 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall develop and implement a safety-based child welfare intervention system (rather than a standardized child endangerment risk assessment protocol), a standardized method for demonstration of proficiency in application of the safety-based child welfare intervention system, and an evaluation of the reliability and validity of the safety-based child welfare intervention system. Requires all child protective investigators and supervisors and child welfare specialists and supervisors employed by the Department to demonstrate proficiency in application of the safety-based child welfare intervention system previous to being permitted to make safety decisions about the children for whom they are responsible. Requires the Department to establish a multi-disciplinary advisory committee to advise the Department and its related contractors in the development and implementation of the safety-based child welfare intervention system. Requires the Department to develop safety-based child welfare intervention system training curriculum. Requires the Department to submit annual reports, beginning on or before December 31, 2026, to the General Assembly on the evaluation of the reliability and validity of the safety-based child welfare intervention system. Makes corresponding changes to the Advisory Committee on Reducing the Disproportionate Representation of African-American Children in Foster Care Act and the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act.
Title
CHILDREN-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0460 |
2023-08-04 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-08-04 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-12 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-05-12 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-05-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2023-05-12 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 008-005-000 |
2023-04-11 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2023-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |