IL SB0414 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits aggravated endangering the life or health of a child when he or she knowingly and willfully deprives a child under the age of 18 of necessary food, shelter, health care, or supervision appropriate to the age of the child, when the person is reasonably able to make the necessary provisions and which deprivation substantially harms the child's physical, mental, or emotional health. Provides that the failure to provide specific medical treatment shall not alone be considered willful deprivation of health care if the person can show that the treatment would conflict with the tenets and practice of a recognized religious denomination of which the person is an adherent or member. Provides that the exception does not in any manner restrict the right of an interested party to petition the court on behalf of the best interest of the child. Provides that this offense is a Class 4 felony.
Title
AGGRAVATED ENDANGERING A CHILD
Sponsors
Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] |
Rep. Curtis Tarver [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Crowe |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 542 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |