IL SB0453 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Uniform Penalty and Interest Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2010-05-04 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=453&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0453.htm |